ID H0649 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 357 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 357 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BREWERIES - Amends existing law to define "brewery" and "winery"; and to allow persons under 21 to enter or be on the premises of a licensed brewery where beer is consumed.
Title
Amends existing law to define "brewery" and "winery"; and to allow persons under 21 to enter or be on the premises of a licensed brewery where beer is consumed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 357 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Keough |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 30-3-2 AYES -- Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- Hill, Martin, Siddoway Absent and excused -- Schmidt, Souza Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Dixon |
2016-03-24 | House | 56-10-4 AYES -- Anderst, Barbieri, Batt, Boyle, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hartgen, Hixon, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Anderson, Andrus, Bell, Beyeler, Burtenshaw, Dayley, Harris, Loertscher, Nielsen, Romrell Absent -- Bateman, Holtzclaw, Kloc, Rubel Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |