ID S1174 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by Governor on 04/21/15 Session Law Chapter 340 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by Governor on 04/21/15 Session Law Chapter 340 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - IDAHO TRANSPORTATION DEPARTMENT - Appropriates $496,641,900 to the Idaho Transportation Department for fiscal year 2016; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 1,698.7; expresses legislative intent for continuously appropriated funds; authorizes the transfer of moneys to the Tourism and Promotion Fund; provides reappropriation authority for dedicated funds; provides reappropriation authority for airport development grants; provides reappropriation of federal stimulus funds; and authorizes a transfer of funds for debt service.
Title
Appropriates $496,641,900 to the Idaho Transportation Department for fiscal year 2016; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 1,698.7; expresses legislative intent for continuously appropriated funds; authorizes the transfer of moneys to the Tourism and Promotion Fund; provides reappropriation authority for dedicated funds; provides reappropriation authority for airport development grants; provides reappropriation of federal stimulus funds; and authorizes a transfer of funds for debt service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/21/15 Session Law Chapter 340 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/13/15 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-04-09 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-09 | House | Youngblood |
2015-04-09 | House | 60-5-5 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Moyle, Nate, Nye, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Cheatham, McMillan, Nielsen, Scott, Sims Absent -- Crane, Erpelding, Monks, Palmer, Vander Woude Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-09 | House | PASSED |
2015-04-09 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2015-04-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-04-08 | Senate | to House |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Keough |
2015-04-08 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Schmidt Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |