ID S1273 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends and adds to existing law to require the Secretary of State to prepare voter guides to be distributed to every household in the state no later than 30 days before an election.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to require the Secretary of State to prepare voter guides to be distributed to every household in the state no later than 30 days before an election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 22-13-0 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |