IL HB0014 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
2011-05-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2011-05-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 6, 2011 |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 023-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 15, 2011 |
2011-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy |
2011-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-02-16 | House | Re-assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2010-12-28 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |