IL HB0109 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that any person who finds a sick, injured, orphaned, or crippled wildlife species protected by this Act may, without a permit, take possession of the wildlife in order to immediately transport it to a permitted rehabilitator. Provides that any person taking possession of sick, injured, orphaned, or crippled wildlife for the purpose of transporting it to a permitted rehabilitator assumes liability for any injury or property damage that he or she incurs from the wildlife. Exempts this activity from prohibitions on taking and retaining live species protected by the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
TRANSPORTING INJURED ANIMALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 2.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=109&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0109.htm |