IL HB0111 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-8)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-8)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Requires PAYGO budgeting. Provides that if a Public Act requires additional spending from State funds, then no appropriation for the additional spending required by the Public Act may be obligated or expended unless the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability certifies to the State Comptroller that the same or another Public Act specifically identifies adequate decreases in expenditures or enhancements in revenues to completely offset the additional spending required by the Public Act. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-PAYGO BUDGETING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2011-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-004-000 |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2011-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000 |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Unes |