IL HB0203 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to develop and implement a neonatal diabetes mellitus registry pilot program. Requires the Department to create an electronic registry to track glycosylated hemoglobin levels of persons. Requires physicians and other healthcare providers treating a patient with diabetes mellitus with onset before 12 months of age to report the occurrence of all such cases to the Department. Requires clinical laboratories performing glycosylated hemoglobin tests for patients with diabetes mellitus with onset before 12 months of age to report the results of each test that the laboratory performs to the Department. Provides that the Department shall allow access of the registry to neonatal diabetes mellitus research institutions. Provides that these provisions are repealed on December 31, 2012. Contains confidentiality provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
DPH-NEONATAL DIABETES REGISTRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-14 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-01-14 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=203&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0203.htm |