IL HB0347 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a person convicted of assault, aggravated assault, battery, or aggravated battery of an elderly person shall not receive any property, benefit, or other interest by reason of the death of that elderly person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROBATE-ASSAULT OF ELDERLY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-02HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0182
2019-08-02HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-02HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-13HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-03-13HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000
2019-02-08HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-04HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
75552-6.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback