IL HB0793 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services, in partnership with other specified State agencies, to eliminate on July 1, 2027 the use of active or pending 14(c) certificates authorized under the federal Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, as well as authorizations permitted under the Minimum Wage Law to pay an employee with a disability less than the minimum wage otherwise required for employees under the Minimum Wage Law. Creates the Transition Grant Fund as a special fund in the State treasury to provide funds, subject to appropriation, to community agencies with active or pending 14(c) certificates to aid in the transition away from subminimum wages for employees with disabilities. Amends the Employment and Economic Opportunity for Persons with Disabilities Task Force Act. Requires the Employment and Economic Opportunity for Persons with Disabilities Task Force (Task Force) to create, by no later than July 1, 2025, a multi-year plan of recommended actions, outcomes, and benchmarks to help the State meets its goal to eliminate the use of 14(c) certificates on and after July 1, 2027. Sets forth certain information and data that shall be included in the multi-year plan to inform the work of the Task Force. Requires the Task Force to include in the multi-year plan certain recommendations aimed as facilitating the elimination of 14(c) certificates. Requires the Task Force to submit the multi-year plan to the Governor and the General Assembly by no later than July 1, 2025 and to provide annual reports on implementation through January 1, 2030. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. In a provision listing the type of not-for-profit agencies whose supplies and services may be procured without advertising or calling for bids, revises the list to include a not-for-profit agency that is (i) certified as a community rehabilitation provider by the Department of Human Services and (ii) accredited by a nationally-recognized accrediting organization or certified as a day services provider by the Department. Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. In the definition of "business owned by a person with a disability", removes from the definition a not-for-profit agency for persons with disabilities that is exempt from taxation under the Internal Revenue Code of 1986. Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2024, the personal needs allowance for a qualifying medical assistance recipient who is a resident in a facility licensed under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act shall equal $100. Provides that beginning January 1, 2025, the personal needs allowance shall increase annually at the same rate as the Social Security cost-of-living adjustment to take effect on January 1 of each year. Amends the Minimum Wage Law. In a provision permitting the Director of Labor to issue regulations providing for the employment of workers with disabilities at wages lower than the wage rate applicable under the Act, provides that the provision is inoperative on and after July 1, 2027. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-05-19 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2023 |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2023-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2023-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted 004-000-000 |
2023-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-05-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-05-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-06 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |