IL HB1133 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that the chairman and vice chairman elected by the board shall be members of the board, but the secretary elected by the board may be either a member of the board or not a member of the board, as determined by the board (instead of the secretary may be a member of the board). Provides that moneys in the working cash fund may be used for any and all community college purposes and may be transferred in whole or in part from the working cash fund to the educational fund or operations and maintenance fund (instead of moneys may be transferred from the working cash fund to the educational fund or operations and maintenance fund) only upon the authority of the board. Provides that a district shall have the authority to increase or again create (instead of just to again create) a working cash fund. Adds further provisions concerning the abatement of a working cash fund. Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL-SEC-WORKING CASH FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0278 |
2023-07-28 | House | Effective Date July 28, 2023 |
2023-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-020-000 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 008-005-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-035-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 007-004-000 |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-33.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |