IL HB1162 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Reproductive Health Act. Restricts a person from opening, conducting, or maintaining a facility in which mobile abortions services are performed. Defines "mobile abortion services" as any abortion-related services provided in a moveable vehicle or nonpermanent clinic.
Title
MOBILE ABORTION-PROHIBITED
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | To Reproductive Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1162&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1162.htm |