IL HB1258 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Labor Law. Provides that no minor under 16 years of age shall be employed, permitted, or allowed to work in any gainful occupation for more than 40 hours (rather than 48 hours) in any one week. Removes a provision limiting the hours of work for minors under the age of 16 to no more than 8 hours a day of combined work hours outside and in school. Provides that a minor 14 years or older who is employed in a recreational or educational activity while school is in session is limited to working 18 (rather than 24) hours in any week. Authorizes the Regional or District Superintendent of Schools to issue an employment certificate that permits a minor under 16 years of age to appear in a play or musical comedy with a professional traveling theatrical production if such minor shall not appear on stage or be present in rehearsals for more than 18 (rather than 24) hours in one week.
Title
CHILD LABOR-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2023 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 013-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 027-000-000 |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 205 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 205 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |