IL HB1365 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Organization Act. Provides that whenever any law or resolution requires a report to the General Assembly, the reporting requirement shall be satisfied by filing one electronic copy (currently, one copy) of the report with each of the following: the Speaker, the Minority Leader and the Clerk of the House of Representatives, and the President, the Minority Leader, and the Secretary of the Senate and the Legislative Research Unit. Requires the reporting entity to make paper copies available of those reports available upon request. Provides that additional electronic copies (currently, copies) shall be filed with the State Government Report Distribution Center for the General Assembly. Amends the State Library Act to make conforming changes.
Title
GA/LIBRARY ELECTRONIC COPIES
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-02 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0489 |
2015-12-04 | House | Effective Date December 4, 2015 |
2015-12-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-12-03 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-12-02 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-12-02 | House | House Concurs |
2015-12-02 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2015-12-02 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-12-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-12-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-12-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-11-10 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-11-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-11-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2015 |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 320 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 5 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |