IL HB1601 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning the offenses of intimidation and aggravated intimidation. Provides that a person also commits intimidation when, with intent to cause another to perform or to omit the performance of any act, he or she communicates to another, directly or indirectly by any means, a threat to cause the person to falsify, amend, or withdraw a report of his or her abuse. Provides that a person commits aggravated intimidation when he or she commits intimidation by causing a person 60 years of age or older or known to be a person with a disability to falsify, amend, or withdraw a report of his or her abuse. Provides that aggravated intimidation under these circumstances is a Class 2 felony for which the offender may be sentenced to a term of imprisonment of not less than 3 years nor more than 14 years. Defines "abuse" and "person with a disability".
Title
CRIM CD-INTIMIDATION-ELDERLY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-6.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1601&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1601.htm |