IL HB2156 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice to offer to consumers at retail a rebate made on a rebate card that charges dormancy fees or other post-issuance fees. Defines "rebate card".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONS FRAUD-REBATE CARD-FEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 70 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 070-046-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseArrived in House
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-20HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-20HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-047-000
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 009-004-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-03-12HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-05HouseRe-assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052LLLAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback