IL HB2430 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning detention or shelter care hearings.
Title
COURTS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-03-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |