IL HB2453 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Requires both the Mass Transit Committee in the House of Representatives and the Transportation Committee in the Senate to hold a public hearing regarding any increase in the revenue recovery ratio or any increase in fares or charges for public transportation. Provides notification requirements for both. Effective immediately.
Title
RTA-FARE INCREASE-HEARING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0634 |
2014-06-06 | House | Effective Date June 6, 2014 |
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 083-022-003 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 083-022-003 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 083-022-003 |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-05-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Al Riley |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Al Riley |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Al Riley |
2014-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2014-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-004-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-002-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2013 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 5, 2013 |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-004-000 |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 7, 2013 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-039-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mass Transit Committee; 013-004-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3615 | 3B.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 5.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |