IL HB2453 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Public Transportation Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Use Tax Act, and the Service Use Tax Act. Beginning July 1, 2018, instead of use and occupation tax collections being deposited into the General Revenue Fund and then transferred monthly by the Comptroller from the General Revenue Fund to the Downstate Public Transportation Fund, requires the Department of Revenue to deposit the designated fraction of the net revenue realized from those collections directly into the Downstate Public Transportation Fund. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
DOWNSTATE PUB TRANS FUNDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0363 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 102-012-000 |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-03-27 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mass Transit Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 740 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |