IL HB2483 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for the purpose of making a grant to Laureus Sport for Good Foundation USA for program and operating expenses for youth development-based sports initiatives. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$GRANT-DHS-YOUTH SPORTS
Sponsors
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Hoan Huynh [D] |
Rep. Lilian Jimenez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-02 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-02 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2483&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB2483.pdf |