IL HB2489 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mobile Home Local Services Tax Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall provide the county collector in each county a quarterly report of the transfer of title of mobile homes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOBILE HOME-TRANSFER REPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Local Government; 007-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3551511.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback