IL HB2541 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0282
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0282
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the supervising officer of a person on parole or mandatory supervised release shall request the Department of Corrections to issue a parole violation warrant, and the Department shall issue a parole violation warrant, under certain circumstances. Provides that the mandatory supervised release term for felony domestic battery, aggravated domestic battery, stalking, aggravated stalking, and a felony violation of an order of protection is 4 years. Provides that a person convicted of a felony domestic battery, aggravated domestic battery, stalking, aggravated stalking, or a felony violation of an order of protection shall be supervised during his or her term of parole or mandatory supervised release by a supervising officer who has completed not less than 40 hours of domestic violence and partner abuse intervention training.
Title
CD CORR-EXTENDED MSR&PROBATION
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Deborah Graham [D] | Rep. Constance Howard [D] | Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] |
Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Eddie Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0282 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001 | |
2009-05-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-05-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-05-07 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-001 | |
2009-04-30 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Enhancements and Redundancy | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard |