IL HB2576 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall create a pilot program for youth deer hunters statewide. Provides that under the pilot program, the Department shall issue 1,500 youth deer licenses annually. Grants the Department rulemaking authority to implement the program. Provides for the sunset of the provision on January 1, 2023.
Title
WILDLIFE-YOUTH DEER PERMITS
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] |
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |