IL HB2578 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Removes a sunset provision concerning increases in a property's overall valuation that are directly attributable to the investment, improvement, replacement, or expansion of railroad operating property through State or federal government programs necessary for high speed passenger rail transportation (currently, those provisions sunset on December 31, 2019). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-PASSENGER RAIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-02HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0186
2019-08-02HouseEffective Date August 2, 2019
2019-08-02HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass Revenue; 005-003-000
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-002-000
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-21HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-21HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-03-06HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520011-80.1Amended CodeCitation Text
3520011-85Amended CodeCitation Text
3520011-90Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback