IL HB2649 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0289
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0289
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person is guilty of a non-probationary Class 3 felony (rather than a Class 4 felony) when the person is convicted of driving under the influence (DUI) of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or any combination thereof (prohibited substances), (rather than the person being convicted of a DUI violation for a second time) and has previously been convicted of reckless homicide or a similar provision of a law of another state in which the person was determined to have been under the influence of prohibited substances as an element of the offense, or in committing a DUI violation, the person was involved in a motor vehicle, snowmobile, all-terrain vehicle, or watercraft accident that resulted in the death of another person, when the DUI violation was a proximate cause of the death. Provides that evidence of a person's blood, urine, breath or other bodily substance concentration of prohibited substances is admissible when gathered by a trained phlebotomist (rather than a trained phlebotomist acting under the direction of a licensed physician) in any civil or criminal action or proceeding arising out of an DUI arrest. Provides that blood or urine tests (rather than only blood tests) performed for the purpose of determining the concentration of prohibited substances are admissible evidence as a business record exception to the hearsay rule in prosecutions for a DUI violation or a similar provision of a local ordinance, or in prosecutions for reckless homicide and makes corresponding changes in the Boat Registration and Safety Act and Snowmobile Registration and Safety Act. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-DUI-RECKLESS HOMICIDE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0289 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date August 11, 2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-001 | |
2009-05-05 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-04-30 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Enhancements and Redundancy | |
2009-04-22 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-04-22 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-04-22 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |