IL HB2685 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Creates the Student Investment Account Act (currently, the Student Loan Investment Act). Adds a provision concerning the use of earnings from the Student Investment Account. Modifies provisions concerning the establishment, operation, and administration of the Student Investment Account by the State Treasurer, and adds requirements concerning income share agreements and income share agreement providers. Allows the State Treasurer to enter into income share agreements with participants (currently, borrowers) and to facilitate such arrangements between participants and eligible income share agreement providers (currently, lenders). Provides that the State Treasurer or his or her designee (currently, only State Treasurer) may charge and collect insurance premiums under the Act. Provides for the creation and use of specified Funds as non-appropriated separate and apart trust funds in the State Treasury (currently, Funds to be held outside of the State Treasury with the State Treasurer as custodian). Amends the Student Loan Servicing Rights Act. Provides that the term "student loan servicer" shall not include, among other entities, the State Treasurer (currently, the State Treasurer and its agents when the agents are acting on the State Treasurer's behalf). Modifies and defines terms. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
IL STUDENT LOAN INVESTMENT ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-01-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-033-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-15 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-003-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 992 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 520 | 22.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |