IL HB2699 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that no person shall dock the tail of any cattle or procure the same to be done, except under certain conditions. Provides that any person who violates the provision is guilty of a Class C misdemeanor and shall pay a fine not to exceed $500 for each animal whose tail was docked. Amends the Veterinary Medicine and Surgery Practice Act of 2004 to make corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMALS-BOVINE TAIL DOCKING
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 115 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 70 | 3.03-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2699&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2699.htm |