IL HB2824 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Changes references from "Homeland Security Emergency Preparedness Fund" and "the Fund" to "Homeland Security Emergency Preparedness Trust Fund" and "the Trust Fund". Provides that the Trust Fund be a federal trust fund. Effective immediately.
Title
IEMA-HOMELAND SEC TRUST FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0036 |
2015-07-14 | House | Effective Date July 14, 2015 |
2015-07-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 17.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |