IL HB2824 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that every dog dealer and cattery operator shall provide for every dog or cat available for sale documentation that indicates that the dog or cat has been microchipped. Requires an animal shelter or animal control facility to provide information to an adopter prior to the time of adoption whether the dog or cat to be adopted was microchipped prior to being placed in the animal shelter or animal control facility. Provides that if a dog or cat turned into an animal shelter has a microchip and the primary contact or owner refuses to reclaim the cat or dog, the shelter shall contact the pet shop operator or rescue organization identified on the microchip and request they claim the dog or cat. Provides that a pet shop operator, dog dealer, or cattery operator may not obtain a dog or cat for resale or sell or offer for sale any dog or cat obtained from a person who has committed violations of certain federal laws or regulations, as tracked by the United States Department of Agriculture. Provides for certain exceptions. Requires pet shop operators to microchip all dogs and cats. Requires pet shop operators to include a disclosure that a dog or cat for sale has been microchipped. Denies home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMAL WELFARE-MICROCHIPPING
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] |
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2824&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2824.htm |