IL HB2839 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that unless the action is governed by the procedures or provisions of another statute, a person suffering legal wrong because of a final administrative decision, or adversely affected or aggrieved by a final administrative decision, is entitled to judicial review of the final administrative decision to the same extent, with the same rights and the same responsibilities, as a person who is a party, except that a person seeking judicial review is not entitled to relief if there was a previous public hearing at which the person failed to present his or her position. Provides that to the extent necessary, such a person may provide new or additional evidence to the court for the limited purpose of demonstrating the legal wrong or adverse effect or impairment that he or she has experienced or may experience as a result of the final administrative decision. Provides that the right to judicial review under the new provisions is limited to final administrative permitting decisions made by the Department of Agriculture, Environmental Protection Agency, Department of Natural Resources, Department of Public Health, or Department of Transportation that impact the public trust in the waters and lands of this State, State parks or natural areas, threatened or endangered species, surface or ground water quality, air quality, or other matters affecting the right to a healthful environment under the Illinois Constitution. Makes a corresponding change in a Section concerning scope of review. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] |
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-27 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 3-101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 3-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |