IL HB2861 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Authorizes the Illinois Power Agency to develop capacity procurement plans and conduct competitive procurement processes for the procurement of capacity to meet the capacity requirements of all retail customers of electric utilities that serve at least 3,000,000 retail customers in this State. Provides for the goal that no later than the delivery year commencing June 1, 2032, the Agency's procurement plans and processes shall include bundled clean capacity in an amount equal to 100% of the electric load measured in megawatt-hours for all retail customers of electric utilities that serve more than 3,000,000 customers in this State. Requires the Planning and Procurement Bureau to develop plans and processes and conduct competitive procurement events to procure capacity for all retail customers of electric utilities that serve at least 3,000,000 retail customers in this State that are located in the Applicable Fixed Resource Requirement Service Area of PJM Interconnection, LLC. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Establishes requirements for procurement of contracts for capacity by the Illinois Power Agency for electric utilities serving at least 3,000,000 retail customers in this State located in the Applicable Fixed Resource Requirement Service Area of PJM Interconnection, LLC. Provides additional findings that the Illinois Commerce Commission must make in granting an application for a certificate of service authority for alternative retail electric suppliers and alternative gas suppliers. Provides additional requirements for an alternative retail electric supplier or alternative gas supplier to comply with when marketing, offering, and providing products or services to residential and small commercial retail customers. Makes changes concerning rates that may be charged by an alternative retail electric supplier, alternative gas supplier, or electric utility or gas utility other than the utility in whose service area a retail customer is located to a customer at the beginning of a contract term or for any renewal term. Provides that the Commission may require an alternative retail electric supplier or alternative gas supplier to enter into a compliance plan if the Commission concludes that an alternative retail electric supplier is violating the Act or the Commission's rules. Provides that any person or entity licensed to engage in the procurement or sale of retail electricity supply for third parties must disclose to each customer the amount of the compensation being charged by the agent, broker, or consultant. Contains provisions concerning alternative retail electric supplier and alternative gas supplier utility assistance recipients; variable gas rate contracts; and expanded use of energy savings programs. Defines terms. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-ELECTRIC PROCUREMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 015-000-001 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |