IL HB2922 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. With certain exceptions, requires each State agency to report the necessary information to the Comptroller by each October 31 for the Comptroller's publication of the State's comprehensive annual financial report by each December 31. Establishes measures to deal with delinquent or insufficient reports from State agencies, including the Comptroller's withholding of compensation and expense reimbursement of the director or secretary of a delinquent State agency and the development of action plans by delinquent State agencies. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPTROLLER-CAFR DEADLINE
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] |
Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Rep. Shane Cultra [R] | Sen. William McCann [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0408 |
2011-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2011 |
2011-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Shane Cultra |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |