IL HB2922 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Creates a provision concerning renewable energy source options. Defines "renewable energy source". Provides that an electric utility or alternative retail electric supplier shall provide to its customers one or more renewable energy source options, which may include renewable energy source default service provided by the electric utility or alternative retail electric supplier. Provides that a renewable energy source default service shall have either all or a portion of its service attributable to a renewable energy source component procured by the electric utility or alternative retail electric supplier, with any remainder filled by standard default service, and that the price of any renewable energy source default service shall be approved by the Illinois Commerce Commission. Provides that under any option offered, the customer shall be purchasing electricity generated by renewable energy sources or the attributes of such generation, either in connection with or separately from the electricity produced. Provides that an electric utility or alternative retail electric supplier shall include educational materials to their customers that explain renewable energy source options being offered. Provides that reasonable efforts shall be made to ensure that the renewable energy source component of an renewable energy source option is not separately advertised, claimed, or sold as part of any other electricity service or transaction. Provides that the Commission shall implement this Section through utility-specific filings, and that an electric utility or alternative retail electric supplier may require that a minimum number of customers choose to participate in the program or a minimum load amount.
Title
UTLITIES-RENEWABLE ENERGY
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2922&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2922.htm |