IL HB2925 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections Ombudsman Bureau is established as a separate bureau within the Department of Corrections. Provides that the Governor shall appoint a Director of the Bureau within 30 days of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the Ombudsman may receive, investigate, and attempt to resolve complaints that the Department: (1) violated a specific law, rule, or Department written policy; or (2) endangered the health or safety or any person. Provides that if the Ombudsman discovers evidence that the Ombudsman reasonably believes constitutes the commission of a crime, the Ombudsman immediately shall, if the Ombudsman considers it appropriate, inform the Director of the Department, who shall conduct an investigation. Provides that an Ombudsman shall be given: (1) appropriate access to the records of an offender who files a complaint; and immediate access to any correctional facility administered or supervised by the Department. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of obstruction of the Ombudsman. This offense is a Class A misdemeanor. Makes other changes.
Title
CD CORR-DEPT OMBUDSMAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 31-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.1-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | Art. Ch. III Art | New Code | See Bill Text |