IL HB2957 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-16 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-16 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Illinois Landscape Architecture Act of 1989 from January 1, 2020 to January 1, 2030. Effective immediately.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-14 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-14 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2019-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-11-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 30, 2019 |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-26 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 315 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |