IL HB3016 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning on January 1, 2020, the tax on gun safes and locks designed to secure firearms is imposed at the rate of 1%. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-GUN SAFES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3016&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3016.htm |