IL HB3152 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Electric Service Customer Choice and Rate Relief Law of 1997 of the Public Utilities Act. In provisions concerning infrastructure investment and modernization: Provides that beginning in 2022, a participating utility other than a combination utility shall pay $10,000,000 per year for 5 years and a participating utility that is a combination utility shall pay $1,000,000 per year for 10 years to the energy low-income and support program, which is intended to fund customer assistance programs with the primary purpose being avoidance of imminent disconnection and reconnecting customers who have been disconnected for nonpayment and makes conforming changes. Makes a change concerning the computation of the performance-based formula rate beginning with the rates applicable for the rate year commencing January 1, 2023, and each rate year thereafter. Removes provisions requiring that, by December 31, 2017, the Illinois Commerce Commission shall prepare and file with the General Assembly a report on the infrastructure program and the performance-based formula rate; provisions making the infrastructure investment and modernization, Smart Grid Advanced Metering Infrastructure Deployment Plan, Illinois Science and Energy Innovation Trust, and Illinois Smart Grid test bed provisions inoperative after December 31, 2022; and provisions limiting the ability of a participating utility to annually update the performance-based formula rate. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITIES-INFRASTRUCTURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2019-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 010-000-001
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 018-000-000
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-08HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-02-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220516-108.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback