IL HB3168 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in felony cases, the presentence report shall include information concerning defendant's eligibility for a sentence to an impact incarceration program administered by the Department of Corrections. Provides that the court shall make a specific finding about whether the defendant is eligible for participation in a Department impact incarceration program, and if not, provide an explanation as to why a sentence to impact incarceration is not an appropriate sentence.
Title
CD CORR-IMPACT INCARCERATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0105 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-001-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-8-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |