IL HB3308 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Directs the System to establish a self-managed plan. The plan applies only to teachers whose employers adopt the plan, and only to teachers who make an election to participate in the plan. Specifies the terms and contents of the plan and the method of electing to participate. Defines terms. Contains a new benefit increase exception. Makes conforming changes to the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act (Article 20 of the Code). Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-TRS SMP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-153.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-153.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3308&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3308.htm |