IL HB3331 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may defer the expiration of the driver's license of a licensee who is serving in the Armed Forces of the United States on active duty outside this State or who is the spouse or a dependent child living with such a licensee until up to 120 (instead of 90) days after the licensee's return to this State. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
VEH CD-DRIV LIC-MILITARY DUTY
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0079 |
2011-07-05 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-07-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 31, 2011 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-000-000 |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |