IL HB3358 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a person who has been denied a Firearm Owner's Identification Card by the Department of State Police for any misdemeanor crime of domestic violence as defined in the federal Gun Control Act of 1968 or whose Firearm Owner's identification Card has been revoked or seized by the Department for that crime may petition the circuit court in writing in the county of his or her residence for a hearing upon the denial, revocation, or seizure (rather than appeal to the Director of State Police for a hearing).
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-DV DENIAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3358&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3358.htm |