IL HB3407 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer who has incurred at least $20,000 in undergraduate student loan debt and has at least $5,000 in outstanding undergraduate student loan debt at the time of the application is entitled to a credit as awarded by the Department of Revenue. Provides that Department of Revenue that the amount of the credit shall not exceed $ 5,000 per taxpayer. Provides that the total amount of credits approved by the Department of Revenue under the provisions of the amendatory Act may not exceed $5,000,000 in any taxable year. Contains recapture provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-STUDENT LOAN
Sponsors
Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3407&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3407.htm |