IL HB3446 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Boards Article of the School Code. In provisions concerning the school report card, provides that a school district's expenditure of Base Funding Minimum and Evidence-Based Funding received from the State in the level of specificity required by the annual spending plans required by the Evidence-Based Funding provisions. In provisions concerning Evidence-Based funding, provides that Organizational Units shall also indicate in their submission of annual spending plans which stakeholder groups the Organizational Unit engaged with to inform annual spending plans. Provides that annual spending plans shall be integrated in annual school district budgets completed pursuant to specified provisions.
Title
SCH CD-EVID BASED FUND-SPEND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 18-8.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |