IL HB3711 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits hate crime when, by reason of the actual or perceived race, color, creed, religion, ancestry, gender, sexual orientation, physical or mental disability, or national origin of another individual or group of individuals, regardless of the existence of any other motivating factor or factors, he or she commits intimidation, stalking, cyberstalking, or transmission of obscene messages. Provides that independent of any criminal prosecution or the result of a criminal prosecution, any person suffering intimidation, stalking, cyberstalking, disorderly conduct, transmission of obscene messages, harassment by telephone, or harassment through electronic communications may bring a civil action for damages, injunction or other appropriate relief. Provides that the Attorney General may bring an action for civil damages for a hate crime in the name of the People of the State. Provides that the court shall impose a civil penalty of $25,000 for each violation of the hate crime statute.
Title
CRIM CD-HATE CRIME-CIVIL PNLTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0197 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-011-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-002-001 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-022-001 |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-24 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |