IL HB3973 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, a person may not become a member of the General Assembly Retirement System. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GARS-NO NEW MEMBERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-09-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kent Gaffney |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2012-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3973&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3973.htm |