IL HB4039 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $578,000 to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority for costs associated with the Creating Healing of Inside Community Educators program at Pinckneyville and Menard Correctional Centers. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$ICJIA-CREATING HEALING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4039&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4039.pdf |