IL HB4059 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall host licensing orientation programs to help educate potential day care center, day care home, and group day care home providers about the child day care licensing process. Provides that the Department shall host licensing orientation programs at least twice annually in each legislative district in the State.
Title
CHILD CARE-LICENSING PROGRAM
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Rep. Jason Bunting [R] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2024-01-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2023-05-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 7.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |