IL HB4175 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that school personnel of any school district, charter school, or nonpublic elementary or secondary school may not engage in corporal punishment of a student, inflict corporal punishment upon a student, or cause corporal punishment to be inflicted upon a student. In provisions concerning the maintenance of discipline, provides that a policy on discipline shall provide that a teacher and others may only use reasonable force as permitted under provisions concerning time out, isolated time out, restraint, and necessities (instead of may use reasonable force as needed to maintain safety for the other students, school personnel, or persons or for the purpose of self-defense or the defense of property). Provides that the policy shall prohibit the use of corporal punishment in all circumstances (instead of the policy shall not include slapping, paddling, or prolonged maintenance of students in physically painful positions nor shall it include the intentional infliction of bodily harm). Makes conforming changes.
Title
SCH CD-NONPUBLIC DISCIPLINE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-026-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-004-000 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | First Reading |
2023-10-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |