IL HB4177 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-06 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1158 |
2013-01-29 | House | Effective Date January 29, 2013 |
2013-01-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-01-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-01-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-01-06 | House | House Concurs |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2012-12-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-12-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2012-12-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-12-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-015-000 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. William Delgado |
2012-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2012 |
2012-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2012 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 007-001-000 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Annazette R. Collins |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Held in Labor |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2012-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2012-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-049-001 |
2012-03-28 | House | Verified |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor Committee; 019-000-001 |
2012-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor Committee |
2012-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |