IL HB4219 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. Removes provisions concerning fentanyl education from the School Code. Provides that the Comprehensive Health Education Program shall include disaster preparedness (instead of survival) and the use and abuse of fentanyl. Makes a change concerning the instruction on mental health and illness. Provides that the curricula on alcohol and drug use and abuse shall be age and developmentally appropriate and may include the information contained in the Substance Use Prevention and Recovery Instruction Resource Guide, as applicable, and makes a change concerning the development and availability of instructional materials and guidelines. Provides that the Program shall include instruction, study, and discussion on the dangers of fentanyl in grades 6 through 12. Sets forth requirements concerning the instruction, study, and discussion, including requiring that students in grades 9 through 12 be assessed. Provides that the instruction, study, and discussion may be taught by a licensed educator, school nurse, or school counselor. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-FENTANYL EDUCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-02-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2023-11-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-11-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-13.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |