IL HB4319 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that every public school shall provide instruction, study, and discussion of current problems and needs in the conservation of natural resources, including climate change. Provides that the content of the climate change curriculum must be supported by the weight of research conducted in compliance with accepted scientific methods and published in peer-reviewed journals or comprised of information recognized as accurate and objective. Provides that the State Board of Education may devise or approve the climate change education curriculum.
Title
SCH CODE-CLIMATE CHANGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4319&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4319.htm |